EP0705043 - Device and method for filtering video images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/14] | Device for filtering video images | ||
[2001/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
d'Alto, Viviana Via Durazzo 5 I-20134 Milano / IT | 02 /
Mancuso, Massimo Via Carabinieri 5 I-92026 Favara (AG) / IT | 03 /
Poluzzi, Rinaldo P.zza Istria 2 Milano / IT | 04 /
Rizzotto, Gianguido Via Belvedere 22/24 Civate (Como) / IT | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1996/14] | Checcacci, Giorgio PORTA, CHECCACCI & BOTTI s.r.l. Viale Sabotino, 19/2 I-20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94830470.4 | 30.09.1994 | [1996/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705043 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0705043 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0705043 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/64, H04N5/21 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
H04N9/646 (EP,US);
H04N5/21 (EP,US);
H03H2222/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Filtern von Videobildern | [2001/09] | English: | Device and method for filtering video images | [2001/09] | French: | Circuit et procédé de filtrage d'image vidéo | [2001/09] |
Former [1996/14] | Vorrichtung zum Filtern von Videobildern | ||
Former [1996/14] | Device for filtering video images | ||
Former [1996/14] | Circuit de filtrage d'image vidéo | Examination procedure | 25.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 03.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.06.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/09] | Request for further processing for: | 28.02.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.03.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4809069 (MEYER EDWIN R [US], et al) [A] 1,17,26 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 21 *; | [A] - ALATTAR A. M., "a probabilistic filter for eliminating temporal noise in time-varying image sequences", 1992 IEEE INTERMATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, SAN DIEGO, CA, (1992), vol. 3 OF 6, doi:doi:10.1109/ISCAS.1992.230218, pages 1491 - 1494, XP000338226 [A] 1,17,26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1992.230218 | [A] - RUSSO & AL., "fuzzy operator for sharpening of noisy images", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, UK, (19920827), vol. 28, no. 18, pages 1725 - 1717, XP000309473 [A] 1,17,26 * the whole document * | [A] - TAGUCHI & AL., "fuzzy filters for image smoothing", PROCEEDINGS SPIE, NONLINEAR PROCESSING V, 7-9 FEBRUARY 1994, SAN JOSE, CA, vol. 2180, pages 332 - 339 [A] 1,17,26 * the whole document * | [A] - KAORU ARAKAWA, "proposal of median-type fuzzy filter and its optimum design", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART 3, (1993), vol. 76, no. 7, pages 27 - 35, XP000442079 [A] 1,17,26 * the whole document * |