EP0718811 - A device for identifying objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.M.S. S.p.A. Via di Vittorio 20/22 I-41054 Marano Sul Panaro Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states C.M.S. S.p.A. Via di Vittorio 20/22 I-41054 Marano Sul Panaro, Modena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salda, Luciano Via de Gasperi, 180 I-41058 Vignola (Modena) / IT | 02 /
Iattoni, Guido Via Nazario Sauro, 213 I-41058 Vignola (Modena) / IT | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94830589.1 | 23.12.1994 | [1996/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718811 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718811 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/00, G07F7/06 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
G07F7/0609 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/26] | Extension states | SI | 28.11.1995 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Identifizieren von Objekten | [1996/26] | English: | A device for identifying objects | [1996/26] | French: | Dispositif destiné à l'identification d'objets | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 21.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3907087 (TANAKA HOSAKU) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 28 *; | [A]EP0146322 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]) [A] 1,4 * claim 5 *; | [A]WO8505207 (DEJOUX ANDRE, et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 1, line 37 - page 2, line 9 * * page 3, line 32 - page 5, line 31 *; | [A]EP0301978 (MULLER SARL [FR], et al) [A] 1,4* abstract * |