EP0623771 - Shut-off valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB MALTE PERSSON & SON Kristinehedsvägen 27 30244 Halmstad / SE | [1999/01] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states Persson, Osborn Lyngavägen 1 S-310 41 Gullbrandstorp / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Ulf Briddesonsg 63b S-302 34 Halmstad / SE | 02 /
Bardén, Lars Snöstorpsv 27 S-302 48 Halmstad / SE | 03 /
Anders, Olson Brogatan 43 S-302 38 Halmstad / SE | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Nilsson, Lennart Lennart Nilsson Patentbyra AB Box 271 311 23 Falkenberg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Nilsson, Lennart Lennart Nilsson Patentbyra AB Box 271 S-311 23 Falkenberg / SE | Application number, filing date | 94850043.4 | 24.03.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | DE19934310160 | 29.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4310160 | [1994/45] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0623771 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0623771 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623771 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/40, B67D5/32, B67D5/06 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
B67D7/0478 (EP);
B67D7/3218 (EP);
F16K17/40 (EP);
F16K17/406 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/45] | F16K17/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/45] | Title | German: | Unterbrechungsventil | [1994/45] | English: | Shut-off valve | [1994/45] | French: | Soupape d'arrêt | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2048388 (BJORNULF JOHNSEN) [X] 1,2,9 * figure 5 *; | [X]US4047548 (WAGNER WALTER D) [X] 1,2,6,9 * figure 2 *; | [X]FR2452043 (HYDEXCO SA) [X] 1,2,9 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4899792 (PODGERS ALEXANDER R [US]) [X] 1-5,9 * column 3, lines 32-43 *; | [X]US5099870 (MOORE GLENN E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * figure 5 *; | [PX]US5244006 (PETTESCH MARTIN C [US]) [PX] 1* column A *; | [E]EP0610986 (BRAVO SERGIO M [US]) [E] 1,2,9 * abstract * |