EP0653568 - Wedge clamping member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THORSMAN & CO AB Box 1010 611 29 Nyköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states THORSMAN & CO AB Box 1010 S-611 29 Nyköping / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsson, Ulf Attingevägen 16 S-611 50 Nyköping / SE | 02 /
Östman, Tommy Idrottsvägen 19 S-611 22 Nyköping / SE | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Wärulf, Olov Oxelösunds Patentbyra HB Sköldvägen 36 613 37 Oxelösund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Wärulf, Olov Oxelösunds Patentbyra HB Sköldvagen 36 S-613 37 Oxelösund / SE | Application number, filing date | 94850179.6 | 07.10.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | SE19930003654 | 05.11.1993 Original published format: SE 9303654 | [1995/20] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0653568 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0653568 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/14, F16B7/04 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
F16B7/0433 (EP);
F16B7/025 (EP);
F16B2/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/20] | F16B2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/20] | Extension states | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klemmvorrichtung mit Keilwirkung | [1995/20] | English: | Wedge clamping member | [1995/20] | French: | Elément de calage | [1995/20] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 03.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/43] | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4027935 (PAPST) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-7; | [XA]FR2274813 (LEGRAND S.A.) [X] 1 * page 3, line 33 - page 7, line 9; figures 1-5 * [A] 2-7; | [A]US3971186 (HAVELKA ET AL.) [A] 1-7 * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 32; figures 1-8 *; | [A]FR2401347 (ARAKAWA CO.) [A] 1-7 * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 9; figures 1-14 * |