EP0658693 - A seal housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT FLYGT AB Box 1309 171 25 Solna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states ITT FLYGT AB Box 1309 S-171 25 Solna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fondelius, Johan Varvsgatan 4 S-117 29 Stockholm / SE | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Larsson, Sten ITT FLYGT AB Box 1309 171 25 Solna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Larsson, Sten ITT FLYGT AB Box 1309 S-171 25 Solna / SE | Application number, filing date | 94850196.0 | 02.11.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | SE19930003791 | 17.11.1993 Original published format: SE 9303791 | [1995/25] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658693 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658693 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/12, F16J15/34 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
F16J15/3404 (EP,US);
F04D29/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [1995/25] | Title | German: | Gehäuse für Wellenabdichtung | [1995/25] | English: | A seal housing | [1995/25] | French: | Boîtier d'étanchéité | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 18.11.1997 | 04   M02   Fee paid on   31.10.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1800888 (KONINK NL MACHF VOORHEEN E H B) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US5195867 (STIRLING THOMAS E [US]) [X] 1-4 * column W *; | [A]US5188509 (SHIMANUKI SHIZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE3137692 (SCANPUMP AB [SE]) [A] 1 |