Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0614956
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.08.2004 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
30.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] |
17.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
05.03.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] |
19.06.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] |
27.06.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] |
20.06.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] |
04.03.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.02.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.02.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.02.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] |
27.09.1996 |
First examination report |
|
21.09.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.02.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.02.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] |
02.02.1995 |
Change - language of procedure |
published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] |
02.02.1995 |
Change - filing language |
published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] |
29.07.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] |