Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3165316B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2001 | B2 | JPH0726125 | 27.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU666423B | Global Dossier | 08.02.1996 | B2 | AU5765194 | 15.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0614956 | Global Dossier | 13.08.1997 | B1 | EP0614956 | 14.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE156854T | 15.08.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9401109 | 18.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69404877T | 02.01.1998 | T2 | DE69404877D1 | 18.09.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0614956T | 16.03.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2108411T | 16.12.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9304940D0 | 28.04.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100308569B | 28.12.2001 | B1 | KR940021664 | 19.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5397641 | 14.03.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9304940 | 11.03.1993 |