EP0653618 - Method and instrument for viscoelastic measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpha Technologies U.S., L.P. 2689 Wingate Avenue Akron, OH 44314-1392 / US | [2004/17] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states SOLUTIA UK Ltd. Corporation Road Newport, South Wales NP9 OXF / GB | ||
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states MONSANTO p.l.c. Monsanto House, Chineham Court, Chineham Basingstoke, Hants, RG24 OUL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, David 19, Roman Way Lechlade, Gloucestershire GL7 3BS / GB | 02 /
Stolc, Michael 16, Basingstoke Close, Freshbrook Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 8RB / GB | 03 /
Rustling, David Geoffrey 25 Matley Moor, Liden Swindon, Wiltshire / GB | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Colens, Alain M.G.M., et al Bureau Colens SPRL Rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Colens, Alain M.G.M., et al Bureau Colens SPRL Rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1998/49] | Colens, Alain, et al c/o Bureau Colens Rue F. Merjay, 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1995/20] | Ernst, Hubert, et al Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No. 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 94870172.7 | 03.11.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | GB19930023544 | 15.11.1993 Original published format: GB 9323544 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0653618 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0653618 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653618 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/16 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
G01N11/165 (EP,US);
G01N33/44 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Viskoelastizitätsmessung | [1995/20] | English: | Method and instrument for viscoelastic measurements | [1995/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de mesures viscoélastiques | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 16.11.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Request for further processing for: | 08.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2004 | BE | 17.03.2004 | CH | 17.03.2004 | LI | 17.03.2004 | NL | 17.03.2004 | DK | 17.06.2004 | GR | 17.06.2004 | SE | 17.06.2004 | PT | 17.08.2004 | IE | 03.11.2004 | LU | 03.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
LU | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 17.06.2004 | |
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 17.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3307619 (SIK KIM DAE) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 26 *; | [A]US3531996 (HARRIS JAMES OLIN, et al) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 16 - line 45 *; | [A]US3534594 (WESTLINNING HERMANN, et al) [A] 12* column W *; | [A]US3535914 (VEITH ALAN G, et al) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 44 *; | [XY]US3538758 (KARPER PAUL W, et al) [X] 12 * column 2, line 44 - column 5, line 5 * [Y] 13; | [Y]EP0043892 (CONTRAVES AG [CH]) [Y] 13 * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 32 *; | [DA]US4552025 (BARKER ROBERT I [US], et al) [DA] 1,8 * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 32 *; | [A]DE3636872 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 12,13 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 46 * |