Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH071109 | Global Dossier | 06.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | AT11693 | 26.01.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0609197 | Global Dossier | 04.09.1996 | B1 | EP0609197 | 03.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT11693 | 26.01.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT399205B | 25.04.1995 | B | ATA11693 | 15.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | AT11693 | 26.01.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59400561D1 | 10.10.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AT11693 | 26.01.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2092881T | 01.12.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AT11693 | 26.01.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO940255L | 27.07.1994 | L | NO940255D0 | 25.01.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | AT11693 | 26.01.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5441390 | 15.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | AT11693 | 26.01.1993 |