EP0609197 - Screw pump for molten metal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ING. RAUCH FERTIGUNGSTECHNIK GESELLSCHAFT m.b.H. Fichtenweg 3 4810 Gmunden / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states ING. RAUCH FERTIGUNGSTECHNIK GESELLSCHAFT m.b.H. Fichtenweg 3 A-4810 Gmunden / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rauch, Erich, Ing. Schmideggstrasse 23 A-4810 Gmunden / AT | 02 /
Rapp, Josef, Ing. Mitterndorf 198 A-4801 Traunkirchen / AT | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Heiner, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 94890019.6 | 24.01.1994 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | AT19930000116 | 26.01.1993 Original published format: AT 11693 | [1994/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609197 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609197 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F04D7/06 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
F04D29/046 (EP,US);
F04D29/044 (EP,US);
F04D29/0465 (EP,US);
F04D29/0467 (EP,US);
F04D29/605 (EP,US);
F04D3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/31] | Title | German: | Schneckenpumpe zum Fördern von Metallschmelzen | [1994/31] | English: | Screw pump for molten metal | [1994/31] | French: | Pompe à vis pour métal fondu | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3048384 (SWEENEY VICTOR D, et al) [A] 1; | [A]DE555861 (ALUMINIUM IND AKT GES) [A] 1; | [A]DE868110 (URBAHN WALTER DIPL-ING) [A] 1; | [A]DE875302 (URBAHN WALTER DIPL-ING) [A] 1; | [A]US3612715 (YEDIDIAH SHMARIAHU) [A] 1 |