EP0625606 - Method and apparatus for wet treatment of textile materials with help of ultrasonic waves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mertinat, Hans Dieter Josef Glanner-Gasse 3 A-2511 Pfaffstätten / AT | [1994/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Berger, Erhard Siebensterngasse 39 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Berger, Erhard, Dr. Siebensterngasse 39 A-1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 94890087.3 | 18.05.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | AT19930000975 | 18.05.1993 Original published format: AT 97593 | [1994/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625606 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625606 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D06B13/00, D06M10/02 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
D06M10/02 (EP);
D06B13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/47] | Extension states | SI | 24.05.1994 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Nassbehandlung von Textilgut mit Hilfe von Ultraschallwellen | [1994/47] | English: | Method and apparatus for wet treatment of textile materials with help of ultrasonic waves | [1994/47] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le traitement au mouillé de matière textiles à d'aide d'ondes ultrasonores | [1994/47] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 13.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.07.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 25.09.1996 | ES | 25.09.1996 | FR | 25.09.1996 | GB | 25.09.1996 | GR | 25.09.1996 | IT | 25.09.1996 | NL | 25.09.1996 | SE | 25.12.1996 | PT | 26.12.1996 | IE | 16.04.1997 | AT | 18.05.1997 | BE | 31.05.1997 | CH | 31.05.1997 | LI | 31.05.1997 | LU | 31.05.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
ES | 25.09.1996 | ||
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
NL | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
IE | 16.04.1997 | ||
AT | 18.05.1997 | ||
BE | 31.05.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
ES | 25.09.1996 | ||
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
IE | 16.04.1997 | ||
AT | 18.05.1997 | ||
BE | 31.05.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [2002/10] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
IE | 16.04.1997 | ||
AT | 18.05.1997 | ||
BE | 31.05.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IE | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 18.05.1997 | ||
BE | 31.05.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
IE | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 18.05.1997 | ||
BE | 31.05.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
IE | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 18.05.1997 | ||
BE | 31.05.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/43] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 18.05.1997 | ||
BE | 31.05.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/40] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 18.05.1997 | ||
BE | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/23] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
BE | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/30] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | SE | 25.12.1996 | |
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 25.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH372864 (SIRIUS SOCIETE ANONYME [LU]) [A] 8 * the whole document *; | [A]US3712085 (GUBERMAN J, et al) [A] 1,8 * figures 1A,1B; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1395288 (TS PK I T BJURO LEGKOI PROMY, et al); | [A]FR2345548 (SUPERBA SA [FR]) [A] * figure 1; claims 1-3 * |