EP0649715 - Device for making annular or tubular articles from concrete [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlüsselbauer, Johann Obergmain 2 A-4674 Altenhof am Hausruck / AT | [1995/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/17] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Heiner, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 94890156.6 | 27.09.1994 | [1995/17] | Priority number, date | AT19930002120 | 21.10.1993 Original published format: AT 212093 | [1995/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649715 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B28B21/10, B28B3/02, B28B13/02 | [1995/17] | CPC: |
B28B21/10 (EP,KR,US);
B28B13/023 (EP,KR,US);
B28B3/021 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Herstellen ring oder rohrförmiger Werkstücke aus Beton | [1995/17] | English: | Device for making annular or tubular articles from concrete | [1995/17] | French: | Dispositif de fabrication de produits en béton de forme annulaire ou tubulaire | [1995/17] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 15.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/10] | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3704881 (PRINZING GEORG GMBH CO KG [DE]) [YD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE1043186 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE, et al) [Y] 1-3 * das ganze Dokument , insbesondere Spalte 3 , Zeile 24 - Spalte 3 , Zeile 27 ; Abbildungen 1-4 *; | [YA]WO8202510 (BUILDERS EQUIP CO [US]) [Y] 2,3 * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 5; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [YA]FR2626808 (BERNARD MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 2,3 * page 6, line 15 - page 6, line 35; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [A]DE532497 (TH GROKE AKT GES) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |