EP0658675 - Door frame, particularly cladding therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goeing, Gerd Viktor-von-Geramb-Strasse 4 8054 Graz / AT | [1997/24] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states rigor Vertriebskoordinations-Gesellschaft m.b.H. Dr.-Heschl-Weg 6 A-8054 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/24] |
Former [1995/25] | 01 /
Goeing, Gerd Viktor-von-Geramb-Strasse 4 A-8054 Graz / AT | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/03] |
Former [1995/25] | Widtmann, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. techn. Clusiusgasse 2/8 A-1090 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 94890204.4 | 07.12.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | AT19930002534 | 14.12.1993 Original published format: AT 253493 | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658675 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E06B1/34, E06B7/23, E06B1/52 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
E06B1/347 (EP);
E06B7/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1995/25] | Title | German: | Türzarge, insbesondere Verkleidung einer Türzarge | [1995/25] | English: | Door frame, particularly cladding therefor | [1995/25] | French: | Bâti dormant de porte, en particulier son habillage | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 05.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/24] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0461101 (RASCHL) [DY] 1-4 * column 5, line 4 - column 6, line 14; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE3303729 (LEIPERT) [Y] 1-4 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 2; figure . *; | [A]DE9308300U (KÜFFNER ALUZARGEN) [A] 1,2,5-7,14,18-20 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0212325 (VEREINIGTE ALUMINIUM-WERKE) [A] 1,12-14 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE1659734 (TESTA) [A] 1,13,14 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]DE2839589 (HERING) [A] 5,6,9,11 * page 8, paragraph 7 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2140066 (PORTAS) [A] 5,6,18 * page 1, line 116 - line 125; figure - *; | [A]DE2207819 (REDEL) [A] 15-17 * page 4, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3609992 (GEISSLER) |