EP0667837 - A PURIFICATION SYSTEM WITH A LAMELLA SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/34] | A PURIFICATION SYSTEM AND A LAMELLA SEPARATOR FOR SEDIMENTATION OF PARTICLES | ||
[1998/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COWICONSULT RADGIVENDE INGENIORER A/S Parallelvej 15 DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | [1995/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Karsten, Krogh Kollemosevej 51 B DK-2830 Virum / DK | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | WITTRUP, Flemming, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard A/S Adelgade 15 DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 94900065.7 | 08.11.1993 | [1995/34] | WO1993DK00363 | Priority number, date | DK19920001360 | 09.11.1992 Original published format: DK 136092 | [1995/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411312 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667837 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667837 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, B01D21/00 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
C02F3/1257 (EP);
B01D21/0045 (EP);
B01D21/0057 (EP);
B01D21/0072 (EP);
B01D21/10 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GR [1995/34] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSSYSTEM MIT LAMELLENSEPARATOR | [1998/31] | English: | A PURIFICATION SYSTEM WITH A LAMELLA SEPARATOR | [1998/31] | French: | SYSTEME DE PURIFICATION AVEC SEPARATEUR A LAMELLES | [1998/31] |
Former [1995/34] | REINIGUNGSSYSTEM UND LAMELLENSEPARATOR ZUR SEDIMENTATION VON TEILCHEN | ||
Former [1995/34] | A PURIFICATION SYSTEM AND A LAMELLA SEPARATOR FOR SEDIMENTATION OF PARTICLES | ||
Former [1995/34] | SYSTEME DE PURIFICATION ET SEPARATEUR A LAMELLES SERVANT A LA SEDIMENTATION DE PARTICULES | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.07.1998 | DE | 30.10.1998 | [2001/23] |
Former [1999/24] | DE | 30.10.1998 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0383674 (OMNIUM TRAITEMENT VALORISA [FR]); | [Y]DE2039422 (WEIJMAN HANE GUNNAR PROF); | [A]WO8200134 (NOVEX FOREIGN TRADE CO LTD [HU], et al); | [A]US3482694 (RICE ARCHIE H, et al); | [A]GB1375458 ; | [A]EP0048630 (NEALVANE LTD [GB]) |