EP0672078 - AROMATIC POLYAMIDE PULP BY MEANS OF CONTINUOUS TRANSFERABLE POLYMERIZATION-ORIENTATION METHOD AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOLON INDUSTRIES, INC. Kolon Bldg., 45 Mugyo-dong Jung-gu Seoul 100-772 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states KOLON INDUSTRIES, INC. Kolon Bldg., 45 Mugyo-dong Jung-gu, Seoul 100-772 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Du, Hyun Pungrim Apartment 203-801 Hyeongkok-dong Kumi City Kyeong Buk 730-040 / KR | 02 /
RYU, Seock, Chul Zanghan Apartment 2-503 Kongdan-1 dong Kumi City Kyeong Buk 730-031 / KR | 03 /
CHOE, Won, Jun Boseung Apartment 7-619 300-5 Bonli-dong Talseou-ku Taegu 704-120 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Young, Hwan Sangsan Villa 302 335-9, Hyeongkok-dong Kumi-city Kyeong Buk 730-040 / KR | 05 /
JI, Chang, Seop Imgwang Apartment 4-910 Maetan-3 dong Paldal-gu, Suwon City Kyeongki-do 441-373 / KR | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94901050.8 | 02.12.1993 | [1995/38] | WO1993KR00108 | Priority number, date | KR19230033392 | 04.12.1992 Original published format: KR 2333392 | KR19170044893 | 02.09.1993 Original published format: KR 1744893 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413727 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672078 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672078 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/32 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
C08G69/28 (EP,US);
D21H13/26 (KR);
C08G69/32 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (KR);
D01F6/605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/38] | Title | German: | AROMATISCHER POLYAMIDZELLSTOFF ERHALTEN DURCH STÄNDIG ÜBERTRAGBARE POLYMERISATIONSORIENTATION, VERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1995/38] | English: | AROMATIC POLYAMIDE PULP BY MEANS OF CONTINUOUS TRANSFERABLE POLYMERIZATION-ORIENTATION METHOD AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARATION THEREOF | [1995/38] | French: | PULPE DE POLYAMIDE AROMATIQUE OBTENUE AU MOYEN D'UN PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION-ORIENTATION TRANSFERABLE EN CONTINU, ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1995/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 02.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 08.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5097015 (MIESS GEORG-EMERICH [DE], et al); | [X]GB2226819 (DU PONT [US]); | [X]AT379157B (RHONE POULENC TEXTILE [FR]) | Examination | - Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, Volume 19, Third Edition,John Wiley & Sons, New York, pp 420-423 | - "TAPPY" T 233 cm-82 | - "TAPPY" T 227 om-85 |