Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0670101
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.12.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] |
19.12.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.02.1998 [1998/06] |
09.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.08.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.08.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.07.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.01.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.01.1997 |
First examination report |
|
19.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.07.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] |
21.07.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] |