EP0670101 - PLUG-IN DIMMER MODULE FOR LIGHTING CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CUNNINGHAM, David W. 8442 Hollywood Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90069 / US | For all designated states ESAKOFF, Gregory F. 9131 Santiago Drive Huntington Beach, CA 92646 / US | [1995/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Fiener, Josef Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94901596.0 | 18.11.1993 | [1995/36] | WO1993US11215 | Priority number, date | US19920978785 | 19.11.1992 Original published format: US 978785 | [1995/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412006 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670101 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670101 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H05B39/00, H05B37/02 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
H05B39/08 (EP,US);
H05B39/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/36] | Title | German: | EINSCHUBEINHEIT ZUR HELLIGKEITSREGELUNG FUER EIN BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [1995/36] | English: | PLUG-IN DIMMER MODULE FOR LIGHTING CONTROL SYSTEM | [1995/36] | French: | MODULE VARIATEUR ENFICHABLE POUR SYSTEME DE REGULATION D'ECLAIRAGE | [1995/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 08.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4972125 (CUNNINGHAM DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6; | [A]US3943397 (YANCEY LEROY D) [A] 1,4,6; | [A]US4769557 (HOUF ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6-8; | [A]EP0466031 (ZUMTOBEL AG [AT]) [A] 2,7; | [A]US4998046 (LESTER JAMES N [US]) [A] 2,7; | [A]US3894265 (HOLMES KENNETH P, et al) [A] 2,7 |