EP0676998 - IMAGING LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOUREPENIS, Steven 7 Grandview Avenue Watertown, MA 02172 / US | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Reitzner, Bruno Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Reitzner, Bruno, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94901668.7 | 23.11.1993 | [1995/42] | WO1993US11387 | Priority number, date | US19920981287 | 25.11.1992 Original published format: US 981287 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412353 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0676998 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0676998 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/38 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
B41M5/38207 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/42] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSVERBUNDFOLIE | [1995/42] | English: | IMAGING LAMINATE | [1995/42] | French: | STRATIFIE SERVANT A LA FORMATION D'UNE IMAGE | [1995/42] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.05.1995 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4123578 (PERRINGTON KENNETH J, et al) [A] 1-20 * column 6, line 24 - line 43; figures 1,4; claim 1 *; | [AD]US5141584 (SCHUH DANA F [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 46; figure 2 *; | [AD]WO8804237 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [AD] 1-20 * page 19, line 1 - page 20, line 12; figure 5; claim 1 *; | [PXD]EP0544334 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [PXD] 1-20 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 3; figures 2-4; claim 1 * |