EP0675787 - A PRODUCTION SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC CASTING OF HOLLOW BODIES, IN PARTICULAR OF CONCRETE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PEDERSHAAB A/S Saltumvej 25 9700 Bronderslev / DK | [1998/35] |
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states PEDERSHAAB A/S Saltumvej 25 DK-9700 Bronderslev / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HVIDEGAARD, Johannes Markedsvej 84 DK-9700 Bronderslev / DK | [1998/35] |
Former [1995/41] | 01 /
HVIDEGAARD, Johannes Markedsvej 84 DK-9700 Br nderslev / DK | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | WITTRUP, Flemming, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard A/S Adelgade 15 DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 94901783.4 | 08.12.1993 | [1995/41] | WO1993DK00415 | Priority number, date | DK19920001481 | 09.12.1992 Original published format: DK 148192 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413448 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0675787 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675787 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B28B21/06, // B28B21/76 | [1995/41] | CPC: |
B28B21/10 (EP,US);
B28B21/76 (EP,US);
B28B21/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/41] | Title | German: | PRODUKTIONSYSTEM ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN GIESSEN VON HOHLKÖRPERN, IM BESONDEREN AUS BETON | [1998/35] | English: | A PRODUCTION SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC CASTING OF HOLLOW BODIES, IN PARTICULAR OF CONCRETE | [1995/41] | French: | SYSTEME DE PRODUCTION POUR LE MOULAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE CORPS CREUX, EN PARTICULIER EN BETON | [1995/41] |
Former [1995/41] | PRODUKTIONSYSTEM ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN GIESSEN VON HOHLKORPERN, IM BESONDEREN AUS BETON | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 04.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 26.08.1998 | GR | 26.08.1998 | IT | 26.08.1998 | LI | 26.08.1998 | PT | 26.11.1998 | SE | 26.11.1998 | LU | 08.12.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | CH | 26.08.1998 | |
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
LU | 08.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | CH | 26.08.1998 | |
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 26.08.1998 | |
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | PT | 26.11.1998 | |
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
CH | 01.12.1998 | ||
LI | 01.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | PT | 26.11.1998 | |
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 26.11.1998 | |
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 26.11.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH388166 (VERKEN AB OTTO [SE]); | [A]DE1584595 (PFEIFFER MASCHF ETTLINGEN); | [A]US3696182 (JOELSON CARL R); | [A]WO9005051 (SCHLUESSELBAUER JOHANN [AT]) |