EP0674664 - METHOD OF CROSS-LINKING CONTACT ADHESIVES BY MEANS OF LASERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.09.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lohmann GmbH & Co. KG Irlicher Strasse 55 56567 Neuwied / DE | [1998/41] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states Lohmann GmbH & Co. KG Irlicher Strasse 55 D-56567 Neuwied / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUM, Walter Kurtriererstrasse 2 D-56567 Neuwied / DE | 02 /
CZECH, Zbigniew Rostocker Strasse 10 D-56566 Neuwied / DE | 03 /
HERRMANN, Fritz Rheinheldestrasse 12c D-56567 Neuwied / DE | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Sperlingsweg 32 D-50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 94901953.3 | 03.12.1993 | [1995/40] | WO1993EP03398 | Priority number, date | DE19924243270 | 21.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4243270 | [1995/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9414853 | Date: | 07.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674664 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0674664 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/46, B01J19/12 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
C09J133/06 (EP);
C08F291/00 (EP);
C09J4/06 (EP);
C09J7/385 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09J4/06, C08F291/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERNETZUNG VON HAFTKLEBERN DURCH EINSATZ VON LASERN | [1995/40] | English: | METHOD OF CROSS-LINKING CONTACT ADHESIVES BY MEANS OF LASERS | [1995/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE RETICULATION DE COLLES CONTACT A L'AIDE DE LASERS | [1995/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 24.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.05.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.05.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 18.08.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.01.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.06.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2000 | DK | 03.12.2000 | GB | 03.12.2000 | IE | 03.12.2000 | ES | 04.12.2000 | SE | 04.12.2000 | BE | 31.12.2000 | CH | 31.12.2000 | LI | 31.12.2000 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 03.12.2000 | |
DK | 03.12.2000 | ||
GB | 03.12.2000 | ||
IE | 03.12.2000 | ||
SE | 04.12.2000 | ||
BE | 31.12.2000 | ||
CH | 31.12.2000 | ||
LI | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 03.12.2000 | |
GB | 03.12.2000 | ||
IE | 03.12.2000 | ||
SE | 04.12.2000 | ||
BE | 31.12.2000 | ||
CH | 31.12.2000 | ||
LI | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 03.12.2000 | |
GB | 03.12.2000 | ||
IE | 03.12.2000 | ||
SE | 04.12.2000 | ||
BE | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/12] | GB | 03.12.2000 | |
IE | 03.12.2000 | ||
SE | 04.12.2000 | ||
BE | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 04.12.2000 | |
BE | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/03] | BE | 31.12.2000 | Cited in | International search | [PX]JPH04370123 ; | [A]EP0109291 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 43, line 4 - line 15 *; | [A]EP0378144 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-19* page 5, line 3 - line 54 *; | [X]EP0380938 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9320112 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-19 * the whole document * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 05, Database accession no. 93-042602, & JPH04370123 A 19921222 (NITTO DENKO) [PX] 1-18 * abstract * |