EP0629823 - VUILLEUMIER HEAT PUMP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/51] | VUILLEUMIER HEAT PUNP DEVICE | ||
[1999/11] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12 Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12 Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHINO, Tsutomu, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1304 Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591 / JP | 02 /
KITAMOTO, Masahiro, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591 / JP | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94902114.1 | 13.12.1993 | [1994/51] | WO1993JP01806 | Priority number, date | JP19920347700 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34770092 | [1994/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9415157 | Date: | 07.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0629823 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.07.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/14, F02G1/044 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
F02G1/0445 (EP,US);
F25B41/00 (KR);
F02G2250/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/51] | F25B9/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB [1994/51] | Title | German: | VUILLEUMIER WÄRMEPUMPENVORRICHTUNG | [1994/51] | English: | VUILLEUMIER HEAT PUMP DEVICE | [1999/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF A THERMOPOMPES DU TYPE VUILLEUMIER | [1994/51] |
Former [1994/51] | VUILLEUMIER HEAT PUNP DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1994 | Translation filed | 29.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.1994 | Search fee paid | 29.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 01.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/10] | 22.08.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3802211 (BAMBERG W, et al) [A] 1 * column A *; | [A]US4642988 (BENSON GLENDON M [US]) [A] 1 * column A *; | [A]GB1113847 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO) [A] 1 * page 4, line 46 - page 4, line 73; figure - * | International search | [A]JPH04198671 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH024174 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS63311050 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |