Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08504046 | Global Dossier | 30.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9203683 | 07.12.1992 | SE9301039 | 02.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0673564 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2000 | B1 | EP0673564 | 27.09.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9203683 | 07.12.1992 | SE9301039 | 02.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69328261T | 30.11.2000 | T2 | DE69328261D1 | 04.05.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | SE9203683 | 07.12.1992 | SE9301039 | 02.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9414245 | Global Dossier | 23.06.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9203683 | 07.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE470542 | 25.07.1994 | B | SE9203683L | 08.06.1994 | L | SE9203683D0 | 07.12.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9203683 | 07.12.1992 |