EP0673564 - A DEVICE FOR CONVERSION OF A BINARY FLOATING-POINT NUMBER INTO A BINARY 2-LOGARITHM OR THE OPPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forskarpatent i Syd AB Ideon 223 70 Lund / SE | [1999/47] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states FÖRSVARETS FORSKNINGSANSTALT S-172 90 Sundbyberg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERTZ, Erik Stenbrötsgatan 21 S-582 47 Linköping / SE | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten S-115 88 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94902160.4 | 02.12.1993 | [1995/39] | WO1993SE01039 | Priority number, date | SE19920003683 | 07.12.1992 Original published format: SE 9203683 | [1995/39] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9414245 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0673564 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673564 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/24, G06F7/38 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
G06F7/556 (EP);
H03M7/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB [2000/13] |
Former [1995/39] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONVERSION EINER BINÄREN GLEITKOMMAZAHL IN EINEN BINÄREN LOGARITHMUS MIT DER BASIS 2 ODER DESSEN UMKEHRUNG | [1995/39] | English: | A DEVICE FOR CONVERSION OF A BINARY FLOATING-POINT NUMBER INTO A BINARY 2-LOGARITHM OR THE OPPOSITE | [1995/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION D'UN NOMBRE BINAIRE A VIRGULE FLOTTANTE EN LOGARITHME-2 BINAIRE OU LE CONTRAIRE | [1995/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1994 | Translation filed | 21.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 25.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.03.2000 | DK | 29.06.2000 | GB | 02.12.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/45] | DK | 29.06.2000 | |
FR | 25.08.2000 | ||
GB | 02.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/12] | FR | 25.08.2000 | |
GB | 02.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | FR | 25.08.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4855741 ; | [A]DE1962725 |