EP0670829 - SYNTHESIS OF SULFATED POLYHYDROXY FATTY ACID AMIDE SURFACTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LETTON, James, Carey 1247 Jeremy Court Forest Park, OH 45240 / US | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 94902396.4 | 24.11.1993 | [1995/37] | WO1993US11452 | Priority number, date | US19920984067 | 30.11.1992 Original published format: US 984067 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412472 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670829 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670829 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C303/24, C07C305/06 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
C11D1/28 (EP,US);
C07C305/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1996/42] |
Former [1995/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SULFIERTER POLYHYDROXYFETTSÄURETENSIDEN | [1995/37] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF SULFATED POLYHYDROXY FATTY ACID AMIDE SURFACTANTS | [1995/37] | French: | SYNTHESE DE TENSIOACTIFS CONTENANT DES AMIDES D'ACIDE GRAS POLYHYDROXY SULFATES | [1995/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US2717894 (SCHWARTZ ANTHONY M) [DA] 1 * column W *; | [A]WO9113057 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1* page 4 - page 5; examples VII,VIII * |