EP0632898 - BUSBAR, IN PARTICULAR FOR AN INDUCTIVE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISCHOF, Rolf Tabarzer Strasse 6 D-99891 Fischbach / DE | 02 /
WEYRICH, Gerd-Uwe Ringstrasse 36 D-99848 Wutha-Farnroda / DE | [1995/02] | Application number, filing date | 94902608.2 | 18.12.1993 | [1995/02] | WO1993DE01221 | Priority number, date | DE19934301596 | 22.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4301596 | [1995/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9417419 | Date: | 04.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632898 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632898 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01P1/02 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
G01P1/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1995/02] | Title | German: | STROMSCHIENE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN INDUKTIVEN SENSOR | [1995/02] | English: | BUSBAR, IN PARTICULAR FOR AN INDUCTIVE SENSOR | [1995/02] | French: | BARRE CONDUCTRICE DESTINEE EN PARTICULIER A UN CAPTEUR INDUCTIF | [1995/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4888551 (HATA YASUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 54 - line 60 * * column 4, line 15 - line 37; figure 2 *; | [A]DE4106104 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 9 - line 61; figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]EP0480844 (JAEGER [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 8 - line 41; figures 2,9 * |