EP0638071 - HETEROCYCLIC CARBONIC ACID DERIVATIVES WHICH BIND TO RETINOID RECEPTORS (RAR) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMURA, Hiroyuki 9-34, Matsushiro 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 02 /
NAGAI, Mitsuo 6-3-511, Ninomiya 4-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 03 /
HIBI, Shigeki 6-1-102, Ninomiya 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 04 /
KIKUCHI, Koichi Tsukubane Dainiryo 201, 9-7, Inarimae Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 05 /
HISHINUMA, Ieharu 4-8, Kubogaoka 3-chome, Moriyamachi Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki 302-01 / JP | 06 /
NAGAKAWA, Junichi 22-8, Ottominami 1-chome Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300 / JP | 07 /
ASADA, Makoto 5-23, Matsushiro 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 08 /
MIYAMOTO, Norimasa 4692-14-201, Yatabe Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 09 /
HIDA, Takayuki 34-6-202, Higashiarai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 10 /
OGASAWARA, Aichi 4-10-20-105, Kasuga 4-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 11 /
YAMATSU, Isao 3605-669, Kashiwadamachi Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-12 / JP | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Thiel, Christian, et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner Schaeferstrasse 18 44623 Herne / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Thiel, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Schaeferstrasse 18 44623 Herne / DE | ||
Former [1995/07] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94903025.8 | 20.12.1993 | [1995/07] | WO1993JP01841 | Priority number, date | JP19920358616 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35861692 | JP19930023450 | 20.01.1993 Original published format: JP 2345093 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9414777 | Date: | 07.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638071 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638071 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/54, A61K31/415, C07D401/06, A61K31/44, C07D491/052, C07D495/04, C07D209/56, C07D417/04, C07D403/04, C07D407/06, C07D409/06 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
C07D231/54 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/415 (KR);
A61K31/44 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/12 (EP);
C07D209/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07D221/18 (EP,US);
C07D277/60 (EP,US);
C07D307/77 (EP,US);
C07D311/92 (EP,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,US);
C07D333/50 (EP,US);
C07D335/08 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/07] | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE CARBONSÄURE-DERIVATE, DIE AN RAR REZEPTOREN BINDEN KÖNNEN | [1995/07] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC CARBONIC ACID DERIVATIVES WHICH BIND TO RETINOID RECEPTORS (RAR) | [1995/07] | French: | DERIVES D'ACIDE CARBONIQUE HETEROCYCLIQUE SE FIXANT SUR DES RECEPTEURS DES RETINOIDES | [1995/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 17.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2614618 (CIRD [FR]) [A] 1-14* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0315539 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0382077 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * claim 1 * | [Y] - KAGECHIKA, "Retinobenzoic acids.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890717), vol. 111, no. 3, Database accession no. 23742t, page 640, column 1 [Y] 1-14 * Compounds 41,46 and 80. * | [ ] - J.MED. CHEM., (1989), vol. 32, no. 5 | [Y] - LEHMANN, "Identification of retinoids with nuclear receptor subtype-selective activities.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920203), vol. 116, no. 5, Database accession no. 34012j, page 28, column 2 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [ ] - CANCER RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 51, no. 18, pages 4804 - 4809 [ ] * See R18 on page 4807 * | [Y] - DELESCLUSE, "Selective high affinity retinoic acid receptor ligands.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920106), vol. 116, no. 1, Database accession no. 1235f, page 128, column 1 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [ ] - MOL. PHARMACOL, (1991), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 556 - 562 [ ] * See page 557, CD 495. * | [A] - KAGECHIKA, "Retinobenzoic acids.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890508), vol. 110, no. 19, Database accession no. 165533d, page 19, column 2 [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [ ] - J.MED.CHEM., (1989), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 834 - 840 [ ] * See page 836, 9(Fv80). * | [A] - COOKSON, "Aromatic musks derived from 1,2,3,4 -Tetrahydro-1,1,4,4,6,7-hexamethylnaphthalene", J.CHEM.SOC.PERKIN TRANS. 1, (1976), pages 195 - 200 [A] 1-14 * See (V) on page 196. * | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 3, 17 July 1989, Columbus, OhioUS; abstract | - no. 23742tKAGECHIKA 'Retinobenzoic acids.' page 640 ;column 1 ; |