EP0670800 - A DEVICE FOR APPLYING A CLOSING STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Business to Business Innovations B.V. 371, Weena 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states Business to Business Innovations B.V. 371, Weena 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states NOVEM TRADING INTERNATIONAL B.V. Weena 371 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN ROSENDAL, Nicolaas Pr. Marijkestraat 2 NL-7902 AJ Hoogeveen / NL | 02 /
TIMMERMANS, Gerardus, Jan, Marie Blankenslaan West 87 NL-7901 BG Hoogeveen / NL | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas, Ir., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 94903139.7 | 07.12.1993 | [1995/37] | WO1993NL00261 | Priority number, date | NL19920002118 | 07.12.1992 Original published format: NL 9202118 | [1995/37] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413542 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670800 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670800 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65B67/06 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
B65B67/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/37] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN EINES VERSCHLIESSSTREIFENS | [1995/37] | English: | A DEVICE FOR APPLYING A CLOSING STRIP | [1995/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION D'UNE BANDE DE SCELLEMENT | [1995/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1994 | Translation filed | 02.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.1997 | BE | 12.03.1997 | SE | 12.06.1997 | [2013/48] |
Former [1998/11] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
BE | 12.03.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
BE | 12.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 12.03.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2898717 (NICOLI VINCENT J) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 34 - line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3218779 (HADDOCK GEORGE M); | [AD]WO8808395 (ROSENDAL NICOLAAS VAN [NL]) [AD] 1,4,5 * page 5, line 12 - page 13, line 13; figures 1,7 * |