EP0728095 - WHEELCHAIR DRIVER AND BRAKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Watwood, Brian M. 6650 Arabian Circle Granite Bay, CA 95746 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states Watwood, Brian, M. 6650 Arabian Circle Granite Bay, CA 95746 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watwood, Brian, M. 6650 Arabian Circle Granite Bay, CA 95746 / US | 02 /
Armstrong, Errol 12032 Hidden Valley Road Grass Valley, CA 95945 / US | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Colens, Alain M.G.M. Bureau Colens SPRL Rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Colens, Alain c/o Bureau Colens SPRL rue Frans Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 94903277.5 | 19.11.1993 | [1996/35] | WO1993US11245 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9513954 | Date: | 26.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728095 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62M1/16 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
A61G5/022 (EP,US);
A61G5/025 (EP,US);
A61G5/1008 (EP,US);
A61G5/1016 (EP,US);
A61G5/1018 (EP,US);
A61G5/1035 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/35] | Title | German: | ROLLSTUHL MIT ANTRIEBSEINHEIT UND BREMSSYSTEM | [1996/35] | English: | WHEELCHAIR DRIVER AND BRAKING SYSTEM | [1996/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF MOTEUR ET DE FREINAGE POUR UNE CHAISE ROULANTE | [1996/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 18.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 18.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 18.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/50] | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.1996 | 30.11.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US5263729 (WATWOOD BRIAN M [US], et al) [E] 1-4,6-17,19-29 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US654986 (KRUEGER THEODORE F [US]); | [A]US838228 (WILLIAMS THOMAS E [US]); | [A]US2643898 (EVEREST HERBERT A, et al); | [A]US3189368 (PETERSEN JAMES F); | [A]US3869146 (BULMER DONALD L); | [A]US3877725 (BARROZA HERBERT); | [A]US4354691 (SAUNDERS GERALD A B, et al); | [A]US4453729 (LUCKEN WESLEY O [US]); | [A]US4506900 (KOROSUE AKIRA [JP]); | [A]US4735431 (TAIT ROBERT E [NZ]); | [A]GB1067901 (BRIAN TAYLOR GOOD); | [A]GB2213438 (MYRON MEDICAL PRODUCTS LIMITED [GB]); | [A]GB2110780 (PLATT NIGEL TERRY WALTER, et al) |