EP0629262 - SEALING PROFILE FOR TUBULAR TUNNEL SEGMENTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR ELEMENTS FLOATED INTO POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHOENIX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hannoversche Strasse 88 21079 Hamburg / DE | [1998/40] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states PHOENIX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hannoversche Strasse 88 D-21079 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLANG, Siegfried Bredengrund 24a D-21149 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
GRABE, Werner Kiefernweg 4 D-21423 Winsen / DE | [1994/51] | Application number, filing date | 94903733.7 | 07.01.1994 | [1994/51] | WO1994DE00010 | Priority number, date | DE19934300786 | 14.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4300786 | [1994/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9416197 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0629262 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0629262 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/38 | [1994/51] | CPC: |
E21D11/385 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/51] | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSPROFIL FÜR TUNNELROHRSEGMENTE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINSCHWIMMELEMENTE | [1994/51] | English: | SEALING PROFILE FOR TUBULAR TUNNEL SEGMENTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR ELEMENTS FLOATED INTO POSITION | [1994/51] | French: | JOINT PROFILE D'ETANCHEITE POUR SEGMENTS TUBULAIRES DE TUNNELS, NOTAMMENT POUR ELEMENTS MIS EN PLACE PAR FLOTTAISON | [1994/51] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Request for further processing for: | 14.01.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 30.09.1998 | PT | 30.12.1998 | DK | 31.12.1998 | LU | 07.01.1999 | IE | 04.05.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/45] | GR | 30.09.1998 | |
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
DK | 31.12.1998 | ||
IE | 04.05.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 30.09.1998 | |
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
IE | 04.05.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 30.09.1998 | |
IE | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/20] | IE | 30.09.1998 | |
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 30.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [DYA]DE3101332 (PHOENIX AG [DE]) [DY] 1,2,8-10,12-18,20 * the whole document * [A] 3-7,11,19; | [A]GB2170561 (PHOENIX AG); | [A]GB2193541 (PHOENIX AG); | [A]EP0270287 (BENFORD EDWARD JOHN); | [Y]GB2210117 (PHOENIX AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8-10,12-18,20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0441250 (PHOENIX AG [DE]); | [A]US5172919 (TAKASAKI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) |