EP0746431 - IMPROVED FASTENING TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENROB LIMITED Unit 12, Aber Park Flint, Clwyd CH6 5EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states HENROB LIMITED Unit 12, Aber Park Flint, Clwyd CH6 5EX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLACKET, Stuart, Edmund 3 Woods Road Closeburn, QLD 4520 / AU | 02 /
FUHRMEISTER, Ralph 14 Jandowae Street Runcorn, QLD 4113 / AU | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Mock, Hans, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [1996/50] | Application number, filing date | 94904102.4 | 07.01.1994 | [1996/50] | WO1994AU00013 | Priority number, date | AU1993PL06704 | 07.01.1993 Original published format: AU PL670493 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9415736 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746431 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0746431 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.07.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B21J15/30, B21J15/32, B25B23/08, B25B23/10 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
B25B23/10 (EP,US);
B21J15/32 (EP,US);
B23P19/006 (EP,US);
B25B23/04 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/50] | Title | German: | SETZGERÄTE | [1996/50] | English: | IMPROVED FASTENING TOOLS | [1996/50] | French: | OUTILS DE MISE EN PLACE AMELIORES POUR MACHINES A RIVETER | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.1995 | Search fee paid | 18.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 18.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 14.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Request for further processing for: | 09.09.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 10.09.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.09.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.10.1995 | 25.09.1995 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   18.10.1995 | 25.09.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.10.1995 | 25.09.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.10.1995 | 25.09.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.10.1995 | 25.09.1995 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   18.10.1995 | 25.09.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   18.10.1995 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.09.1995 | M01   Fee paid on   18.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.04.2003 | IT | 02.04.2003 | NL | 02.04.2003 | SE | 02.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 02.04.2003 | |
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 02.04.2003 | |
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 02.04.2003 | |
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 02.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2901749 (CROSSEN WILLIAM P, et al) [X] 1-3,14,17,18,20,25,26 * figure -; claims 1,2 * [A] 40; | [A]FR2052075 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE) [A] 1-5,20,21 * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 13; figure 7 *; | [A]US4615475 (FUHRMEISTER RALPH [AU]) [A] 1,22,23,28* figure 2 *; | [XA]GB2206828 (SMITH NEVILLE JOHN) [X] 1-3,11,13-17,19,20,25,26 * page 4, line 11 - line 28; figure - * [A] 12,40; | [XA]EP0387430 (GEN ELECTRO MECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,11,17,19,20,25-38,40 * figure -; claims 1-5 * [A] 12,39; | [PX]EP0567240 (ARIEL IND PLC [GB]) [PX] 1-8,20-23,25-37 * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 11; figure - * | International search | [X]GB1506398 (VINER B); | [X]EP0113421 (ZUCCHELLI MARIO); | [X]AU2850684 (NIETEK PTY LTD); | [X]DE3802154 (NEUMANN HELMHARD [DE]); | [X]DE4132504 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]); | [X]WO9309918 (HENROB LTD [GB]); | [X]EP0547638 (WUERTH ADOLF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |