Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0676988
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.03.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
12.03.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
11.02.2000 |
Refusal of application |
published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] |
03.02.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
26.10.1999 |
Application refused |
|
30.07.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] |
17.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
13.05.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] |
01.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.11.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.10.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.04.1997 |
First examination report |
|
28.03.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.11.1995 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] |
21.11.1995 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] |
01.09.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] |
01.09.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] |