EP0676988 - METHOD FOR APPLYING AUTODEPOSITION COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 2500 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 200 Gulph Mills Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 2500 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 200 Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Pike, Suite 150 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | ||
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Avenue, Suite 150 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMED, Bashir M. 54052 Whitby Way Utica, MI 48316 / US | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1995/42] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94904822.7 | 14.12.1993 | [1995/42] | WO1993US11912 | Priority number, date | US19920999479 | 30.12.1992 Original published format: US 999479 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9415719 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0676988 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/02, B05D1/26, B05D7/16, B05D7/14 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
C09D5/088 (EP,US);
B05D7/142 (EP,US);
B05D1/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/42] | B05D1/02, B05D1/26, B05D7/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG SELBSTABSCHEIDENDER BESCHICHTUNG | [1995/42] | English: | METHOD FOR APPLYING AUTODEPOSITION COATING | [1995/42] | French: | PROCEDE D'APPLICATION DE REVETEMENT PAR AUTODEPOT | [1995/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.1995 | Search fee paid | 13.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 03.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/13] | 08.11.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4313983 (CHAKER MOUHANAD) [X] 1,2,7,12 * column 8, line 58 * | International search | [Y]US4160756 (NISHIDA TAKAO, et al); | [Y]US4347172 (NISHIDA TAKAO, et al); | [Y]US4178400 (LOCHEL FRANK P JR [US]); | [Y]US5011715 (BROADBENT RONALD W [US]); | [Y]US4243704 (HALL WILBUR S, et al); | [Y]US4636265 (FISCHER HERBERT [DE], et al); | [Y]US4636264 (SCHELLENBERG LUTZ [DE], et al) |