15.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
25.10.2002 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] |
03.07.2002 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
03.07.2002 |
Opposition rejected |
|
08.03.2002 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] |
23.11.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
19.09.2001 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
06.08.2001 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
17.07.2001 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
15.05.2001 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
29.12.2000 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
01.12.2000 |
Opposition filed |
published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] |
14.01.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |
23.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
21.05.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] |
21.05.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] |
09.03.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.10.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.09.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.06.1998 |
First examination report |
|
10.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.11.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.08.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.08.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |
25.08.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |