blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0675943

EP0675943 - FABRIC CONDITIONING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Former [1995/41]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HARMALKER, Subhash
11 Gifford Road
Somerset, NJ 08873 / US
02 / GRANDMAIRE, Jean-Paul
Rue Sous-le-Château 45
B-4821 Andrimont / BE
[1995/41]
Representative(s)Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1995/41]Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date94904845.820.12.1993
[1995/41]
WO1993US12207
Priority number, dateUS1992099484722.12.1992         Original published format: US 994847
US1993004006330.03.1993         Original published format: US 40063
[1995/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9414937
Date:07.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0675943
Date:11.10.1995
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0675943
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.07.1994
ClassificationIPC:C11D1/62, C11D1/52, C11D3/02, C11D3/20
[1999/27]
CPC:
C11D3/2079 (EP,US); C11D1/526 (EP,US); C11D1/528 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US); C11D3/2082 (EP,US); C11D3/2086 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1995/41]C11D3/00, C11D1/52, C11D1/62, C11D3/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/41]
TitleGerman:WAESCHEWEICHMACHERZUSAMMENSETZUNG FUER GEWEBE[1995/41]
English:FABRIC CONDITIONING COMPOSITION[1995/41]
French:COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT DE TISSUS[1995/41]
Entry into regional phase18.07.1995National basic fee paid 
18.07.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/41]
16.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.1999Fee for grant paid
11.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.11.2000    ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/03]
Opponent(s)01  30.11.2000    ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
05.01.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.08.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.06.2002Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/50]
12.06.2002Date of oral proceedings
08.07.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.07.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE20.12.2000
[2002/17]
Former [2002/02]IE05.09.2001
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0038862  (ALBRIGHT & WILSON [GB]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0340872  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *;
 [A]EP0423894  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [DX]EP0459211  (KAO CORP [JP]) [DX] 1-20 * page 3, line 18 - line 20 * * page 5, line 6 - line 11; claim - *;
 [A]EP0479608  (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [D]US5133885  (CONTOR LAURA [BE], et al)
ExaminationUS3954630
 EP0413249
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.