EP0680366 - SYSTEM FOR FIRE EXTINGUISHING USING, FIRST, A HIGH PRESSURE AUTOMATIC FIRE FIGHTING INSTALLATION AND, SECOND, A FIRE TRUCK PROVIDED WITH A HIGH PRESSURE PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNDHOLM, Göran Ilmari Kiannon kuja 3 04310 Tuusula / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states SUNDHOLM, Göran Ilmari Kiannon kuja 3 SF-04310 Tuusula / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94905113.0 | 21.01.1994 | [1995/45] | WO1994FI00025 | Priority number, date | FI19930000233 | 21.01.1993 Original published format: FI 930233 | [1995/45] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9416770 | Date: | 04.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680366 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680366 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A62C27/00, B60K17/22, B60K25/02 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
B60K25/02 (EP,US);
A62C27/00 (EP,US);
A62C3/00 (EP,US);
B60K25/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | FEUERLÖSCHGERÄT, DAS EINE AUTOMATISCHE HOCHDRUCK-FEUERBEKÄMPPFUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND EIN MIT HOCHDRUCKPUMPE AUSGERÜSTETES BRANDSCHUTZFAHRZEUG KOMBINIERT | [1995/45] | English: | SYSTEM FOR FIRE EXTINGUISHING USING, FIRST, A HIGH PRESSURE AUTOMATIC FIRE FIGHTING INSTALLATION AND, SECOND, A FIRE TRUCK PROVIDED WITH A HIGH PRESSURE PUMP | [1995/45] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXTINCTION DES INCENDIES COMBINANT UNE INSTALLATION D'EXTINCTION AUTOMATIQUE A HAUTE PRESSION ET UN CAMION D'INCENDIE MUNI D'UNE POMPE A HAUTE PRESSION | [1995/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.1994 | Translation filed | 22.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 23.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3825078 ; | [Y]WO9222353 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]); | [A]GB2248884 (HEREFORD AND WORCESTER COUNTY [GB]); | [A]EP0249529 (CAMIVA [FR]); | [A]FR2599679 (CAMIVA [FR]); | [A]WO9215370 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]); | [A]WO9220453 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]); | [A]WO9220454 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]); | [PA]WO9310859 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]); | [PA]WO9310861 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]); | [PA]WO9310860 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]); | [PA]WO9300962 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]) |