EP0682109 - CYCLIC NUCLEOTIDASE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Toshio 2673-2, Fujikata Tsu-shi, Mie 514 / JP | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94905225.2 | 28.01.1994 | [1995/46] | WO1994JP00121 | Priority number, date | JP19930013150 | 29.01.1993 Original published format: JP 1315093 | [1995/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9417181 | Date: | 04.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682109 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/16 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
C12N9/16 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | ZYKLISCHE NUKLEOTIDASE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [1995/46] | English: | CYCLIC NUCLEOTIDASE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1995/46] | French: | NUCLEOTIDASE CYCLIQUE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1995/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1995 | Translation filed | 10.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1995 | Search fee paid | 10.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/43] | 16.04.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9218541 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [PX] - MUKAI J ET AL, "ISOLATION AND DRUG SENSITIVITY OF NOVEL CYCLIC NUCLEOTIDE PHOSPHODIESTERASE ISOZYME IN RAT CEREBRUM.", 66TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE JAPANESE PHARMACOLOGICAL SOCIETY, YOKOHAMA, JAPAN, MARCH 24-27, 1993. JPN J PHARMACOL 61 (SUPPL. 1). 1993. 329P. CODEN: JJPAAZ ISSN: 0021-5198, XP000670722 [PX] 1,2 * Abstract no. P-573 * | [T] - MUKAI, JUN ET AL, "Separation and characterization of a novel isoenzyme of cyclic nucleotide phosphodiesterase from rat cerebrum", BR. J. PHARMACOL. (1994), 111(2), 389-90 CODEN: BJPCBM;ISSN: 0007-1188, (1994), XP000670714 [T] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [A] - Mol. Pharmacol., Vol. 29, No. 5 (1986), HARRISON S.A. et al.: "Isolation and Characterization of Bovine Cardiac Muscle Cyclic GMP-Inhibited Phosphodiesterase A Receptor for New Cardiotonic Drugs", p. 506-514. | [A] - J. Biol. Chem., Vol. 263, No. 30 (1988), KRANIAS E.G. et al.: "Purification and Characterization of Phospholamban Phosphatase from Cardiacmuscle", p. 15681-15687. |