EP0634831 - STEPPING MOTOR OF MULTIPHASE HYBRID TYPE AND DRIVE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/03] | METHOD FOR DRIVING STEPPING MOTOR OF MULTIPHASE HYBRID TYPE | ||
[1998/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINEBEA CO., LTD. 4106-73, Ohazamiyota, Miyota-cho Kitasaku-gun Nagano 389-02 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states MINEBEA CO., LTD. 4106-73, Ohazamiyota, Miyota-cho Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-02 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMURA, Noriyuki, M. C. L. Karuizawa-seisakushonai, 4106-73, Ohazamiyota Miyota-cho, Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-02 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Kenji, Minebea Co. Ltd. Karuizawa-seisakushonai, 4106-73, Ohazamiyota Miyota-cho, Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-02 / JP | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94905242.7 | 01.02.1994 | [1995/03] | WO1994JP00138 | Priority number, date | JP19930036056 | 01.02.1993 Original published format: JP 3605693 | [1995/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9418742 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634831 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634831 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02K37/04, H02K37/18 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
H02K37/18 (EP);
H02K37/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1995/03] | H02K37/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/03] | Title | German: | SCHRITTMOTOR DER HYBRIDISCHEN MEHRPHASIGEN BAUART UND ANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [1998/30] | English: | STEPPING MOTOR OF MULTIPHASE HYBRID TYPE AND DRIVE ARRANGEMENT | [1998/30] | French: | MOTEUR PAS-A-PAS DE TYPE HYBRIDE MULTIPHASE ET SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT | [1998/30] |
Former [1995/03] | ANTRIEBSVERFAHREN EINES SCHRITTMOTORS DER HYBRIDISCHEN MEHRPHASIGEN BAUART | ||
Former [1995/03] | METHOD FOR DRIVING STEPPING MOTOR OF MULTIPHASE HYBRID TYPE | ||
Former [1995/03] | METHODE D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN MOTEUR PAS-A-PAS DE TYPE HYBRIDE MULTIPHASE | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1994 | Translation filed | 28.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 28.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2342994 (GERHARD BERGER FABRIKATION ELE) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH0132748B ; | [Y]JPS61185056 (MERETSUKU KK); | [Y]JPS60111382U | Examination | US4000452 | EP0581612 |