Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9520563 | Global Dossier | 03.08.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3565857B | Global Dossier | 15.09.2004 | B2 | JPH09508372 | 26.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU696792B | Global Dossier | 17.09.1998 | B2 | AU5971494 | 15.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0741686 | Global Dossier | 22.04.1998 | B1 | EP0741686 | 13.11.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59405814D1 | 28.05.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0741686T | 22.02.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2118379T | 16.09.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI962994 | 26.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO309678B | 12.03.2001 | B1 | NO963129L | 27.09.1996 | L | NO963129D0 | 26.07.1996 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5783602 | 21.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9400215 | 27.01.1994 |