EP0742844 - HI-DENSITY SINTERED ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STACKPOLE LIMITED 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states STACKPOLE LIMITED 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIVANATH, Rohith 238 Aldercrest Road Toronto, Ontario M8W 4J7 / CA | 02 /
JONES, Peter 3 Dalston Road Toronto, Ontario M8W 4R4 / CA | 03 /
THIEN DUC THIEU, Danny 21 Highfield Road Toronto, Ontario M4L 2T7 / CA | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 94906111.3 | 07.02.1994 | [1996/47] | WO1994CA00065 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9521275 | Date: | 10.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742844 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C22C33/02 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
C22C33/0264 (EP,US);
B22F3/10 (EP,US);
B22F3/1007 (EP,US);
C21D1/32 (EP,US);
C22C33/02 (EP,US);
C22C33/0228 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, C22C33/0207, C22C33/0214, B22F3/24 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00, F16C7/023 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | GESINTERTE LEGIERUNG VON HOHER DICHTE | [1996/47] | English: | HI-DENSITY SINTERED ALLOY | [1996/47] | French: | ALLIAGE FRITTE HAUTE DENSITE | [1996/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.08.1996 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 16.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/36] | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2027598 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-21 * page 5, line 11 - line 30; examples 1,7 *; | [A]FR2084728 (BIRMINGHAM SMALL ARMS CO) [A] 1-6,10,11,14-18 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 21; claims 1,6-8,10-12,14 *; | [Y]FR2292543 (KREBSOEGE GMBH SINTERMETALL [DE]) [Y] 1-21 * example 1; claims 1,4,5 *; | [X]US4018632 (SCHMIDT HOWARD) [X] 1,13-15 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 13; claims 1,2 *; | [X]GB2116589 (DAVY MCKEE) [X] 17 * page 1, line 1 - line 35 *; | [A]DE3219324 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]) [A] 1,10-13,17,18* examples 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0421811 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * example 2 *; | [E]WO9405822 (STACKPOLE LTD [CA], et al) [E] 1-18 * page 7, line 1 - page 13, line 3; claims 1-9 * |