blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0682843

EP0682843 - TIME-COMPRESSED SIGNAL RECORDING AND REPRODUCING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 25.04.2001 [2001/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH
Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[2000/01]
Former [1995/47]For all designated states
DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH
Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3
D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KAADEN, Jürgen
Im Tannhörnle 10
D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
02 / OLDERMANN, Klaus
Oderstrasse 103
D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[1995/47]
Application number, filing date94906180.831.01.1994
[1995/47]
WO1994EP00267
Priority number, dateDE1993430345308.02.1993         Original published format: DE 4303453
[1995/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9418793
Date:18.08.1994
Language:DE
[1994/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0682843
Date:22.11.1995
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0682843
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.08.1994
ClassificationIPC:H04N5/92, H04N5/93
[1995/47]
CPC:
H04N21/2383 (EP,US); H04N5/92 (EP,KR,US); G11B15/1875 (EP,US);
G11B15/4731 (EP,US); G11B27/005 (EP,US); H04N21/4382 (EP,US);
H04N5/937 (EP,US); H04N7/56 (EP,US); H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US); H04N5/945 (EP,US); H04N5/956 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUFZEICHNEN UND WIEDERGEBEN EINES ZEITKOMPRIMIERTEN SIGNALS[1995/47]
English:TIME-COMPRESSED SIGNAL RECORDING AND REPRODUCING PROCESS[1995/47]
French:PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DE REPRODUCTION DE SIGNAUX COMPRIMES DANS LE TEMPS[1995/47]
Entry into regional phase29.07.1995National basic fee paid 
29.07.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/47]
06.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB05.04.2000
[2001/17]
Cited inInternational search[A]US4949187  (COHEN JASON M [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 3 - line 35 *;
 [A]US4703465  (PARKER LORNE A [US]) [A] 1 * column A *;
 [A]EP0488337  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 39 - line 51 *;
 [A]DE3820835  (BLUM BURKHARDT URSULA [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 44 - line 68 *;
 [A]US4785358  (NINOMIYA TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 1 * column A *;
 [A]EP0521191  (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0454460  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationDE3808198
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.