EP0697137 - CERAMIC DISCHARGE VESSEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 D-81543 München / DE | ||
For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÜNGST, Stefan Herzog-Ludwig-Strasse 44 D-85604 Zorneding / DE | 02 /
MAEKAWA, Kouichiro 5-1-303, Showa 2-chome Ichinomiya-shi Aichi-ken 491 / JP | 03 /
ASANO, Osamu 1201-9, Terahigashi Kitsuneana Takehana-cho Hashima-shi Gifu-ken 501-62 / JP | 04 /
HÜTTINGER, Roland Kapellenstrasse 14 D-82287 Jesenwang / DE | 05 /
CLARK, Jens Josef-Maier-Promenade 3 D-85560 Ebersberg / DE | [1996/08] | Representative(s) | Pokorny, Gerd OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | Pokorny, Gerd c/o Osram Gmbh, Rechts- und Patentabteilung, Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94906222.8 | 04.02.1994 | [1996/08] | WO1994EP00324 | Priority number, date | EP19930101831 | 05.02.1993 Original published format: EP 93101831 | [1996/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9418693 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0697137 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0697137 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/36, H01J9/32 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
H01J9/247 (EP,US);
H01J61/363 (EP,US);
H01J61/366 (EP,US);
H01J61/827 (EP,US);
H01J9/323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/08] | Title | German: | KERAMISCHES ENTLADUNGSGEFÄSS UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1996/08] | English: | CERAMIC DISCHARGE VESSEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [1996/08] | French: | RECIPIENT DE DECHARGE EN CERAMIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1996/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 09.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [1998/15] |
Former [1998/03] | DE | 24.07.1997 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPS63143738 ; | [A]JPS62123647 ; | [A]EP0052844 (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 9 - line 12 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 7; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0060582 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 12, line 14 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0272930 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 27 * * column 8, line 30 - line 52; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE9112690U (PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT) [DA] 1,2,4,5,11,14 * claim 1 * * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 16 * * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *; | [DPA]EP0528428 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE], et al) [DPA] 1,2,4,5,11 * claims 1,2 * * column 3, line 24 - line 34 * * column 5, line 34 - line 46 * * column 13, line 24 - line 27 * * column 15, line 11 - line 15 ** column 18, line 3 - line 29; figures 1,2,8 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881026), vol. 12, no. 403, Database accession no. (E - 674), & JP63143738 A 19880616 (TOSHIBA) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,3,6,8,9,14 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871110), vol. 11, no. 343, Database accession no. (E - 555), & JP62123647 A 19870604 (TOSHIBA) [A] 1-3,7,12 * abstract * |