Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08506688 | Global Dossier | 16.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9400324 | 04.02.1994 | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0697137 | Global Dossier | 23.04.1997 | B1 | EP0697137 | 21.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9400324 | 04.02.1994 | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | EP94906222 | 04.02.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69402848T | 19.03.1998 | T2 | DE69402848D1 | 28.05.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9400324 | 04.02.1994 | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9422090U | 05.03.1998 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE69402848 | 04.02.1994 | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5592049 | 07.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US14696993 | 03.11.1993 | US55382795 | 06.11.1995 | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5637960 | 10.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9400324 | 04.02.1994 | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5810635 | 22.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US14696993 | 03.11.1993 | US55382795 | 06.11.1995 | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | US70511496 | 29.08.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9418693 | Global Dossier | 18.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3317774B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2002 | B2 | JPH0721990 | 24.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0609477 | Global Dossier | 06.05.1999 | B1 | EP0609477 | 10.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1066852C | 06.06.2001 | C | CN1117324 | 21.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1070640C | 05.09.2001 | C | CN1092206 | 14.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69324790T | 21.10.1999 | T2 | DE69324790D1 | 10.06.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU215141 | 28.09.1998 | B | HUT71073 | 28.11.1995 | A | HU9502319D0 | 30.10.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU220173 | 28.11.2001 | B | HUH3854 | 30.03.1998 | A | HU9400334D0 | 30.05.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP93101831 | 05.02.1993 |