EP0678042 - A SYSTEM FOR FILLING AN ANAESTHETIC VAPORIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2001 [2001/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McDONALD, Lee, I. 34 Royal Oak Drive Barrie, Ontario L4M 456 / CA | 02 /
HAMM, Hans 1 Pailey Court Shanty Bay, Ontario L0L 2L0 / CA | 03 /
GENGA, Rodolfo Via Agli, 16 I-00144 Rome / IT | 04 /
DE RUBEIS, Fabio Via Ardeatina, 128 I-00042 Anzio / IT | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94906540.3 | 06.01.1994 | [1995/43] | WO1994US00213 | Priority number, date | IT1993RM00007 | 07.01.1993 Original published format: IT RM930007 | [1995/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9415656 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678042 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678042 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, A61M16/18 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
A61M16/183 (EP);
A61M16/0875 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/43] | A61M16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM FÜLLEN EINES ANÄSTHETISCHEN ZERSTÄUBERS | [2000/49] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR FILLING AN ANAESTHETIC VAPORIZER | [1995/43] | French: | SYSTEME DE REMPLISSAGE D'EVAPORATEUR A ANESTHESIE | [1995/43] |
Former [1995/43] | SYSTEM ZUM FÜLLEN EINS ANÄSTHETISCHEN ZERSTÄUBERS | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1995 | Search fee paid | 05.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 05.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 19.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4011288 (ASSENHEIMER ROBERT, et al) [A] 1-3,10,14 * column 3, line 26 - line 50; figures 3,4 *; | [A]GB2055307 (BARD INC C R) [A] 1-3,10,14 * page 4, line 93 - line 115; figures 2,5 *; | [A]GB2105695 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1-3,10,14* page 5, line 6 - line 26; figure 12 * | International search | [A]US3565133 (JONES WILFRED); | [A]US4607671 (AALTO WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [A]US4867212 (MOHR HELMUT [DE], et al); | [A]US4971048 (SEEKINS DARRELL [US]); | [A]US5144991 (WALLROTH CARL-FRIEDRICH [DE], et al); | [A]US5170823 (GREGORY RAYMOND S [GB], et al); | [AP]US5269350 (GALLOWAY EDWIN J [US]); | [AE]US5287898 (FALB WOLFGANG [DE], et al) |