EP0670959 - PROTECTIVE SYSTEM FOR A SUPERCHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/24] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNLAND, Stefan Richard-Wagner-Strasse 16 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 02 /
TORNO, Oskar Schillerstrasse 10 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 03 /
HAEMING, Werner Nachtigallenweg 15 D-74861 Neudenau / DE | 04 /
ROTHHAAR, Ulrich Osswald-Hesse-Strasse 57 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
SURJADI, Iwan Tannenweg 51 D-71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 06 /
HILBERT, Wolfgang Paul-Hindemith-Strasse 14 D-71696 Möglingen / DE | 07 /
SLOBODA, Robert Am Marktplatz 13 D-71706 Markgröningen / DE | 08 /
BAEUERLE, Michael Uhlandstrasse 14 D-74354 Besigheim / DE | [1995/37] | Application number, filing date | 94906886.0 | 23.02.1994 | [1995/37] | WO1994DE00182 | Priority number, date | DE19934310261 | 30.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4310261 | [1995/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9423190 | Date: | 13.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670959 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670959 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02D33/02, F02B39/16, F02D41/22 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
F02B39/16 (EP,US);
F02D33/02 (KR);
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F02D41/221 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1995/37] | Title | German: | SCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR EINE MIT AUFLADUNG BETRIEBENE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [1995/37] | English: | PROTECTIVE SYSTEM FOR A SUPERCHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1995/37] | French: | SYSTEME DE PROTECTION POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE SURALIMENTE | [1995/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 25.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH0343644 ; | [X]JPS61265331 ; | [X]JPS57193737 ; | [Y]JPS606029 ; | [A]US4470390 (OMORI NORIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-7 * column 1, line 36 - line 56 ** column 4, line 47 - column 7, line 41 *; | [Y]US4603552 (KIDO YOSHINOBU [JP]) [Y] 2 * column W * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910510), vol. 15, no. 182, Database accession no. (M - 1111), & JP03043644 A 19910225 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP.) [X] 1,4,11 * abstract * [Y] 2,3 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870417), vol. 11, no. 123, Database accession no. (M - 581), & JP61265331 A 19861125 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD.) [X] 1,4,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830222), vol. 7, no. 44, Database accession no. (M - 195), & JP57193737 A 19821129 (TOYO KOGYO KK) [X] 1,4,5,8,11 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850525), vol. 9, no. 121, Database accession no. (M - 382), & JP60006029 A 19850112 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KK) [Y] 3 * abstract * |