EP0688411 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/52] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFUHL, Berthold Graf-Hartmann-Strasse 59/1 D-71706 Markgroeningen / DE | 02 /
ZEHNER, Friedhelm Vaihinger Strasse 35 D-71643 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
ZUMBRAEGEL, Joachim Vahinger Strasse 16 D-71735 Eberdingen / DE | [1995/52] | Application number, filing date | 94906887.8 | 19.02.1994 | [1995/52] | WO1994DE00183 | Priority number, date | DE19934307990 | 13.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4307990 | [1995/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9421947 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688411 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688411 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/07 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
F15B13/0402 (EP,US);
F16K11/07 (KR);
F15B13/044 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8671 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86734 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/52] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHES STEUERVENTIL | [1995/52] | English: | HYDRAULIC CONTROL VALVE | [1995/52] | French: | SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE | [1995/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3370613 (WEAVER PAUL J) [A] 1-11; | [A]US3735780 (HEID W) [A] 1-11; | [A]US3902526 (BRAKE CECIL CLIFFORD, et al) [A] 1-11; | [A]US5092365 (NEFF JAMES A [US])[A] 1-11 |