EP0686024 - THICKENING MIXTURE BASED ON GUAR GUM OR NON-IONIC CELLULOSE AND A CROSS-LINKED POLYMER, AND COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL HAIR- OR SKIN-CARE COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAID MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUPUIS, Christine 15, rue Seveste F-75018 Paris / FR | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94906950.4 | 16.02.1994 | [1995/50] | WO1994FR00170 | Priority number, date | FR19930002065 | 23.02.1993 Original published format: FR 9302065 | [1995/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9418935 | Date: | 01.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686024 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686024 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/48 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K8/8158 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/006 (EP,US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61Q7/00 (EP,US);
A61Q9/02 (EP,US);
A61K2800/5422 (EP,US);
A61K2800/594 (EP,US);
Y10S424/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/50] | Title | German: | VERDICKUNGSMITTEL ENTHALTEND EINE KOMBINATION AUS GARGUMMI ODER NICHTIONISCHE CELLULOSE UND EINEM VERNETZTEN POLYMER UND KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HAAR UND HAUTBEHANDLUNG, DIE EINE SOLCHE KOMBINATION ENTHALTEN | [1997/19] | English: | THICKENING MIXTURE BASED ON GUAR GUM OR NON-IONIC CELLULOSE AND A CROSS-LINKED POLYMER, AND COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL HAIR- OR SKIN-CARE COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAID MIXTURE | [1995/50] | French: | ASSOCIATION EPAISSISSANTE A BASE DE GOMME DE GUAR OU DE CELLULOSE NON-IONIQUE ET D'UN POLYMERE RETICULE ET COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE OU DERMATOLOGIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES CHEVEUX OU DE LA PEAU CONTENANT UNE TELLE ASSOCIATION | [1995/50] |
Former [1995/50] | VERDICKUNGSMITTEL ENTHALTEND EINE KOMBINATION AUS GARGUMMI ODER NICHTIONISCHE CELLULOSE UND EINEM VERNETZTEN POLYMER UND KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HAAR UND HAUTBEHANDLUNG, DIE EINESOLCHE KOMBINATION ENTHALTEN | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0152095 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0200620 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-11 * examples 1,4; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9221316 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP0524434 (CURTIS HELENE IND INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 55 - line 58 * * page 6, line 1 - line 3 * * examples 1-7 * |