EP0708812 - AQUEOUS LUBRICANT AND SURFACE CONDITIONER FOR FORMED METAL SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION The Triad, Suite 200, 2200 Renaissance Boulevard Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Avenue, Suite 150 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERSHAS, James, P. 2284 Strader West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US | 02 /
KELLY, Timm, L. 998 Suffield Birmingham, MI 48009 / US | 03 /
ROCHFORT, Gary, L. 2770 Northampton Troy, MI 48083 / US | 04 /
Rossmaier, Henry, A. Henkel KGaA Division MC Duesseldorf 40191 / DE | [1996/42] |
Former [1996/18] | 01 /
BERSHAS, James, P. 2284 Strader West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US | ||
02 /
KELLY, Timm, L. 998 Suffield Birmingham, MI 48009 / US | |||
03 /
ROCHFORT, Gary, L. 2770 Northampton Troy, MI 48083 / US | |||
04 /
ROSSMAIER, Henry, A. 34408 Sandpebble Drive Sterling Heights, MI 48310 / US | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | ||
Former [1996/18] | Sanderson, Laurence Andrew SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 94907136.9 | 04.01.1994 | [1996/18] | WO1994US00024 | Priority number, date | US19930090724 | 13.07.1993 Original published format: US 90724 | US19930109791 | 23.09.1993 Original published format: US 109791 | US19930143803 | 27.10.1993 Original published format: US 143803 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502660 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708812 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.01.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C10M173/02, B21B45/02, C23C22/34, C23C22/36 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
C23C22/361 (EP);
C10M125/10 (EP);
C10M129/26 (EP);
C10M133/06 (EP);
C10M135/10 (EP);
C10M137/06 (EP);
C10M173/02 (EP);
C23C22/34 (EP);
C10M2201/00 (EP);
C10M2201/02 (EP);
C10M2201/041 (EP);
C10M2201/042 (EP);
C10M2201/06 (EP);
C10M2201/062 (EP);
C10M2201/08 (EP);
C10M2201/081 (EP);
C10M2201/082 (EP);
C10M2201/084 (EP);
C10M2201/085 (EP);
C10M2201/18 (EP);
C10M2207/022 (EP);
C10M2207/10 (EP);
C10M2207/121 (EP);
C10M2207/122 (EP);
C10M2207/123 (EP);
C10M2207/125 (EP);
C10M2207/128 (EP);
C10M2207/129 (EP);
C10M2207/22 (EP);
C10M2209/04 (EP);
C10M2209/08 (EP);
C10M2209/104 (EP);
C10M2209/105 (EP);
C10M2209/108 (EP);
C10M2209/109 (EP);
C10M2209/12 (EP);
C10M2215/04 (EP);
C10M2215/042 (EP);
C10M2215/08 (EP);
C10M2215/082 (EP);
C10M2215/26 (EP);
C10M2215/28 (EP);
C10M2217/00 (EP);
C10M2219/042 (EP);
C10M2219/044 (EP);
C10M2221/00 (EP);
C10M2223/04 (EP);
C10M2223/041 (EP);
C10M2223/042 (EP);
C10M2223/043 (EP);
C10M2225/00 (EP);
C10M2229/02 (EP);
C10M2229/05 (EP);
C10N2050/01 (EP);
C10N2070/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M173/02, C10M125/10, C10M129/26, C10M133/06, C10M135/10, C10M137/06 (EP);
C10M2201/00, C10M2201/00 (EP);
C10M2201/06, C10M2201/06 (EP);
C10M2201/18, C10M2201/18 (EP); |
Former IPC [1996/18] | C10M173/02, B21B45/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, SE [1996/18] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGES SCHMIERMITTEL UND OBERFLÄCHEBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL FÜR GEBILDETE METALLOBERFLÄCHEN | [1996/18] | English: | AQUEOUS LUBRICANT AND SURFACE CONDITIONER FOR FORMED METAL SURFACES | [1996/18] | French: | AGENT DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE SURFACE/LUBRIFIANT AQUEUX POUR DES SURFACES METALLIQUES FORMEES | [1996/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 12.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4521321 (ANDERSON PATRICIA A [CA], et al) [Y] 1-3,9,10,12-15 * column 4, line 19 - line 22 *; | [Y]GB875972 (COLLARDIN GMBH GERHARD) [Y] 1-3,9,10,12-15 * page 3; example II * * page 4, line 11 - line 12 *; | [Y]US3661784 (BELLOS THOMAS J) [Y] 1-3,9,10,12-15 * claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US5139586 (DAS NARAYAN [US]); | [Y]US5064500 (AWAD SAMI B [US]); | [Y]US5030323 (AWAD SAMI B [US]); | [Y]US4490536 (CORTI MIGUEL [US], et al); | [A]US5061389 (REICHGOTT DAVID W [US]); | [A]US4921552 (SANDER LOTHAR S [US], et al) |