EP0690727 - HEXADENTATE LIGANDS USEFUL IN RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL, INC. 675 McDonnell Blvd, P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL, INC. 675 McDonnell Blvd, P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, William, L. 434 W. Madison Kirkwood, MO 63122 / US | 02 /
RAJAGOPALAN, Raghavan 13031 Vinson Court Maryland Heights, MO 63043 / US | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94907172.4 | 04.01.1994 | [1996/02] | WO1994US00281 | Priority number, date | US19930001132 | 06.01.1993 Original published format: US 1132 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9415647 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690727 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/50, A61K43/00, C07B59/00, C07F13/00, C07C229/16 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
A61K51/0478 (EP);
C07F9/5027 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/02] | A61K49/02, C07F9/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1996/02] | Title | German: | SECHSZÄHNIGE LIGANDEN FÜR DIE VERWENDUNG IN RÖNTGENOGRAPHISCHEN BILDGEBENDEN WIRKSTOFFEN | [1996/02] | English: | HEXADENTATE LIGANDS USEFUL IN RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGING AGENTS | [1996/02] | French: | LIGANDS HEXADENTES UTILES DANS LES AGENTS D'IMAGERIE RADIOGRAPHIQUE | [1996/02] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.1995 | Search fee paid | 25.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.07.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9210466 (MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL) [X] 1-26 * the whole document * | International search | [E]US5243073 ; | [XY]US3048480 ; | [Y]US5112594 ; | [Y]US5112595 ; | [Y]US4795626 ; | [Y]US4917879 |