EP0680324 - METHOD AND COMPOSITION EMPLOYING (2R,4S) ITRACONAZOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEPRACOR, INC. 33 Locke Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | For all designated states GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY 37th and O Streets, N.W. Washington, DC 20057 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states SEPRACOR, INC. 33 Locke Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | ||
For all designated states GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY 37th and "O" Streets, N.W. Washington, D.C. 20057 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAY, Nancy M. 33 Locke Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 02 /
WOOSLEY, Raymond L. SW 108 Medical-Dental Bldng. 3900 Reservoir Road, NW Washington, DC 20007 / US | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | ||
Former [1995/45] | Harvey, David Gareth, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94907326.6 | 27.01.1994 | [1995/45] | WO1994US00920 | Priority number, date | US19930009706 | 27.01.1993 Original published format: US 9706 | [1995/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9416700 | Date: | 04.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680324 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61K31/50, A61P31/10 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/45] | A61K31/495, A61K31/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ITRACONAZOL | [1995/45] | English: | METHOD AND COMPOSITION EMPLOYING (2R,4S) ITRACONAZOLE | [1995/45] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISANT DU (2R, 4S) ITRACONAZOLE | [1995/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1995 | Search fee paid | 13.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 22.10.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/38] | 29.04.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9319061 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A] - N.S. RYDER, "Biochemical mode of action and enantiomeric selectivity of SDZ 89-485, a new triazole antimycotic.", J.MED. VET. MYCOL., vol. 28, no. 5, pages 385 - 394, XP000562001 | International search | [Y]US4267179 (HEERES JAN, et al) |