EP0683731 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DROPLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TONEJET CORPORATION PTY LTD 210 Greenhill Road Eastwood, S.A. 5063 / AU | [1995/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIMA-MARQUES, Luis 24 Brookside Road Darlington, S.A. 5047 / AU | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94907456.1 | 11.02.1994 | [1995/48] | WO1994AU00065 | Priority number, date | AU1993PL07274 | 12.02.1993 Original published format: AU PL727493 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9418011 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683731 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683731 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.08.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/06, B05B1/02, B05B5/025, B41J2/175 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
B05B5/007 (EP);
B05B5/001 (EP);
B05B5/0255 (EP);
B05B5/0536 (EP);
B41J2/06 (EP);
B41J2/17593 (EP);
B41J2002/061 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/48] | B41J2/06, B05B1/02, B05B5/025 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TROPFEN | [1995/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DROPLETS | [1995/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE GOUTTELETTES | [1995/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1995 | Search fee paid | 25.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 25.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2000 | BE | 20.09.2000 | CH | 20.09.2000 | ES | 20.09.2000 | GR | 20.09.2000 | IT | 20.09.2000 | LI | 20.09.2000 | DK | 20.12.2000 | PT | 20.12.2000 | SE | 20.12.2000 | LU | 11.02.2001 | IE | 12.02.2001 | MC | 28.02.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/39] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
GR | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
DK | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
LU | 11.02.2001 | ||
IE | 12.02.2001 | ||
MC | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
GR | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
DK | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
LU | 11.02.2001 | ||
IE | 12.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
GR | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
DK | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 12.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
DK | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 12.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 12.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 12.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | BE | 20.09.2000 | |
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | BE | 20.09.2000 | |
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 20.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03184855 ; | [A]US4943818 (HOTOMI HIDEO [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911111), vol. 015, no. 441, Database accession no. (M - 1177), & JP03184855 A 19910812 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [PA]JP05057907 ; | [A]US4349829 (BOVIO MICHELE, et al); | [A]EP0097823 (IBM [US]); | [Y]US4490731 (VAUGHT JOHN L [US]); | [A]US4575737 (VERMOT-GAUD JACQUES [CH], et al); | [Y]EP0178880 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [Y]EP0181218 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [Y]EP0213240 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [Y]US4717926 (HOTOMI HIDEO [JP]); | [PY]WO9311866 (AUSTRALIA RES LAB [AU]) | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, M-1443, page 46; & JP,A,05 057 907 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) 9 March 1993 (09.03.93), Abstract., & JP05057907 A 19930309 |